PA HB1065 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-10)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Act No. 25
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 3033 over Redbank Creek in Brookville Borough, Jefferson County, as the CPL James Slagle 2nd Ranger Battalion Army Ranger WWII Memorial Bridge.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 3033 over Redbank Creek in Brookville Borough, Jefferson County, as the CPL James Slagle 2nd Ranger Battalion Army Ranger WWII Memorial Bridge.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1065 PN 1226, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Floor: HB 1065 PN 1226, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28SenateAct No. 25
2019-06-28SenateApproved by the Governor
2019-06-19SenatePresented to the Governor
2019-06-19SenateSigned in House
2019-06-18SenateSigned in Senate
2019-06-18SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2019-06-17SenateSecond consideration
2019-06-12SenateFirst consideration
2019-06-12SenateReported as committed
2019-05-03SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2019-05-01SenateIn the Senate
2019-05-01HouseThird consideration and final passage (190-0)
2019-05-01HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-04-30HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-04-30HouseSecond consideration
2019-04-29HouseRemoved from table
2019-04-10HouseLaid on the table
2019-04-10HouseFirst consideration
2019-04-10HouseReported as committed
2019-04-05HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1065
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1065&pn=1226
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=04/10/2019&RollCallId=356
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=248
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/01/2019&RollCallId=411
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=19&theDate=06/12/2019&RollCallId=294
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=148

Bill Comments

feedback