PA HB108 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 42-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-09 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-09 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 62 (Procurement) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in general provisions, providing for public access to procurement information.
Title
In general provisions, providing for public access to procurement information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-08 - House - HB 108 PN 308, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - HB 108 PN 60, 2011 A206, GRELL (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - HB 108 PN 60, 2011 A206, GRELL (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-09 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2011-02-08 | Senate | In the Senate |
2011-02-08 | House | Third consideration and final passage (197-0) |
2011-02-07 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2011-01-31 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-01-31 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2011-01-25 | House | Removed from table |
2011-01-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-01-25 | House | First consideration |
2011-01-25 | House | Reported as committed |
2011-01-19 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |