PA HB11 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-08 - Referred to INTERGOVERNMENTAL OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Intergovernmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-08 - Referred to INTERGOVERNMENTAL OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Intergovernmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act establishing the Lean Government Practices Program; and conferring powers and imposing duties on the Governor's Office of Transformation, Innovation, Management and Efficiency.
Title
Establishing the Lean Government Practices Program; and conferring powers and imposing duties on the Governor's Office of Transformation, Innovation, Management and Efficiency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House Floor: HB 11 PN 1446, FP (Y: 178 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - House Floor: HB 11 PN 1036, 2015 A700, GROVE (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Urban Affairs: Adopt Amendment A00397 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Urban Affairs: Adopt Amendment A00397 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House Floor: HB 11 PN 1446, FP (Y: 178 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - House Floor: HB 11 PN 1036, 2015 A700, GROVE (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Urban Affairs: Adopt Amendment A00397 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Urban Affairs: Adopt Amendment A00397 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-08 | Senate | Referred to INTERGOVERNMENTAL OPERATIONS |
2015-05-06 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-05-06 | House | Third consideration and final passage (178-17) |
2015-05-06 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-05-05 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-05-05 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2015-04-20 | House | Removed from table |
2015-03-31 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-03-31 | House | First consideration |
2015-03-31 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-01-27 | House | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS |