PA HB1100 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-29 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-29 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in sales and use tax, further providing for exclusions from sales and use tax.
Title
In sales and use tax, further providing for exclusions from sales and use tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-22 - House - HB 1100 PN 1676, FP (Y: 179 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-29 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |
2012-05-22 | Senate | In the Senate |
2012-05-22 | House | Third consideration and final passage (179-19) |
2012-05-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2012-05-02 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2012-05-02 | House | Second consideration |
2012-04-30 | House | Removed from table |
2012-02-09 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-12-13 | House | Removed from table |
2011-12-07 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-12-07 | House | Removed from table |
2011-10-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-10-19 | House | First consideration |
2011-10-19 | House | Reported as committed |
2011-04-28 | House | Referred to FINANCE |