PA HB1164 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-14 - Act No. 46
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-14 - Act No. 46
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for veteran students to receive a course scheduling preference at public institutions of higher education.
Title
Providing for veteran students to receive a course scheduling preference at public institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-07 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-03 - House - HB 1164 PN 1605, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-03 - House - HB 1164 PN 1605, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-14 | Senate | Act No. 46 |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Signed in House |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-02-04 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2013-06-10 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |
2013-06-03 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-06-03 | House | Third consideration and final passage (191-0) |
2013-06-03 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-05-15 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-05-15 | House | Second consideration |
2013-05-07 | House | Removed from table |
2013-04-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-04-24 | House | First consideration |
2013-04-24 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-04-09 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |