PA HB1170 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Passed on October 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-07 - Act No. 75
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Passed on October 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-07 - Act No. 75
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act prohibiting the employment of unauthorized employees; requiring construction industry employers to verify the Social Security numbers of employees; and imposing penalties.
Title
Prohibiting the employment of unauthorized employees; requiring construction industry employers to verify the Social Security numbers of employees; and imposing penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1170 PN 2129, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1170 PN 2129, A2909, MUTH AMENDMENT NO. A-2909 (Y: 7 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1170 PN 2129, FP (Y: 170 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1170 PN 2009, 2019 A1909, MOT APPEAL CHAIR, DERMODY (Y: 107 N: 89 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1170 PN 2009, 2019 A1912, RAVENSTAHL (Y: 90 N: 106 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1170 PN 2009, 2019 A1910, KENYATTA (Y: 86 N: 110 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1170 PN 2009, 2019 A1904, FIEDLER (Y: 89 N: 106 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1170 PN 2009, 2019 A1903, DONATUCCI (Y: 90 N: 106 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1170 PN 2009, 2019 A1900, RABB (Y: 90 N: 106 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1170 PN 2009, 2019 A1897, RABB (Y: 90 N: 106 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1170 PN 2009, 2019 A1895, INNAMORATO (Y: 87 N: 109 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1170 PN 2009, 2019 A1894, DELLOSO (Y: 90 N: 106 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1170 PN 2009, 2019 A1888, DEASY (Y: 90 N: 106 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1170 PN 2009, 2019 A1905, HOHENSTEIN (Y: 87 N: 109 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1170 PN 2009, 2019 A1908, KRUEGER (Y: 86 N: 110 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1170 PN 2009, 2019 A1907, HOHENSTEIN (Y: 87 N: 109 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1170 PN 2009, 2019 A1879, BRADFORD (Y: 86 N: 110 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1170 PN 2009, 2019 A1878, BRADFORD (Y: 85 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1170 PN 2009, 2019 A1896, ISAACSON (Y: 86 N: 110 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1170 PN 2009, 2019 A1893, KRUEGER (Y: 86 N: 110 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1170 PN 2009, 2019 A1891, DONATUCCI (Y: 85 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1170 PN 2009, 2019 A1881, D. MILLER (Y: 91 N: 106 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1170 PN 2009, 2019 A1880, D. MILLER (Y: 89 N: 107 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1170 PN 2009, 2019 A1843, MACKENZIE (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A01602 (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-04 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A01603 (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-04 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A01605 (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-04 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A01535 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1170 PN 2129, A2909, MUTH AMENDMENT NO. A-2909 (Y: 7 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1170 PN 2129, FP (Y: 170 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1170 PN 2009, 2019 A1909, MOT APPEAL CHAIR, DERMODY (Y: 107 N: 89 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1170 PN 2009, 2019 A1912, RAVENSTAHL (Y: 90 N: 106 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1170 PN 2009, 2019 A1910, KENYATTA (Y: 86 N: 110 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1170 PN 2009, 2019 A1904, FIEDLER (Y: 89 N: 106 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1170 PN 2009, 2019 A1903, DONATUCCI (Y: 90 N: 106 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1170 PN 2009, 2019 A1900, RABB (Y: 90 N: 106 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1170 PN 2009, 2019 A1897, RABB (Y: 90 N: 106 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1170 PN 2009, 2019 A1895, INNAMORATO (Y: 87 N: 109 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1170 PN 2009, 2019 A1894, DELLOSO (Y: 90 N: 106 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1170 PN 2009, 2019 A1888, DEASY (Y: 90 N: 106 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1170 PN 2009, 2019 A1905, HOHENSTEIN (Y: 87 N: 109 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1170 PN 2009, 2019 A1908, KRUEGER (Y: 86 N: 110 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1170 PN 2009, 2019 A1907, HOHENSTEIN (Y: 87 N: 109 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1170 PN 2009, 2019 A1879, BRADFORD (Y: 86 N: 110 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1170 PN 2009, 2019 A1878, BRADFORD (Y: 85 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1170 PN 2009, 2019 A1896, ISAACSON (Y: 86 N: 110 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1170 PN 2009, 2019 A1893, KRUEGER (Y: 86 N: 110 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1170 PN 2009, 2019 A1891, DONATUCCI (Y: 85 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1170 PN 2009, 2019 A1881, D. MILLER (Y: 91 N: 106 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1170 PN 2009, 2019 A1880, D. MILLER (Y: 89 N: 107 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1170 PN 2009, 2019 A1843, MACKENZIE (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A01602 (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-04 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A01603 (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-04 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A01605 (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-04 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A01535 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-07 | Senate | Act No. 75 |
2019-10-07 | Senate | Became Law without Governor's signature |
2019-09-26 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Signed in House |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (46-3) |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-06-24 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |
2019-06-17 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-06-17 | House | Third consideration and final passage (170-28) |
2019-06-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-12 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-12 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2019-06-12 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-04 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2019-06-04 | House | First consideration |
2019-06-04 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |