PA HB1219 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-07 - Act No. 50
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-07 - Act No. 50
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 2011 over the East Branch of Sideling Hill Creek, Monroe Township, Bedford County, as the Donald H. Clark Memorial Bridge.
Title
Designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 2011 over the East Branch of Sideling Hill Creek, Monroe Township, Bedford County, as the Donald H. Clark Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Rep. Dick Hess [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-30 - Senate - HB 1219 PN 1329, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - HB 1219 PN 1329, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - HB 1219 PN 1329, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-07 | Senate | Act No. 50 |
2011-07-07 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2011-06-30 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2011-06-30 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2011-06-30 | Senate | Signed in House |
2011-06-30 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2011-06-29 | Senate | Second consideration |
2011-06-21 | Senate | First consideration |
2011-06-21 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2011-06-03 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2011-05-25 | Senate | In the Senate |
2011-05-25 | House | Third consideration and final passage (199-0) |
2011-05-25 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2011-05-24 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-05-24 | House | Second consideration |
2011-05-23 | House | Removed from table |
2011-05-03 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-05-03 | House | First consideration |
2011-05-03 | House | Reported as committed |
2011-03-28 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |