PA HB1232 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.343, No.176), known as The Fiscal Code, in additional special funds, providing for the Enhanced Revenue Collection Account; in 2018-2019 budget implementation, further providing for Department of Revenue; and making an editorial change.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In additional special funds, providing for the Enhanced Revenue Collection Account; in 2018-2019 budget implementation, further providing for Department of Revenue; and making an editorial change.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1232 PN 1444, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A01377 (Y: 9 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-19SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-19SenateSecond consideration
2019-06-18SenateFirst consideration
2019-06-18SenateReported as committed
2019-06-14SenateReferred to FINANCE
2019-06-12SenateIn the Senate
2019-06-12HouseThird consideration and final passage (196-0)
2019-06-12HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-04HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-04HouseSecond consideration
2019-06-03HouseRemoved from table
2019-05-15HouseLaid on the table
2019-05-15HouseFirst consideration
2019-05-15HouseReported as committed
2019-04-16HouseReferred to FINANCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1232
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1232&pn=1444
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=16&theDate=05/15/2019&RollCallId=568
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=16&theDate=05/15/2019&RollCallId=569
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=424
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/12/2019&RollCallId=769
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=25&theDate=06/18/2019&RollCallId=339

Bill Comments

feedback