PA HB1235 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 7 2007 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-01-14 - Laid on the table
Status: Engrossed on July 7 2007 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-01-14 - Laid on the table
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for grading the offense of impersonating a public servant, for exceptions to the prohibition of interception and disclosure of certain communications, for challenge to criminal history records, for review of challenge and for appeals.
Title
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for grading the offense of impersonating a public servant, for exceptions to the prohibition of interception and disclosure of certain communications, for challenge to criminal history records, for review of challenge and for appeals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-01-14 | Laid on the table | |
2007-11-20 | First consideration | |
2007-11-20 | Reported as committed | |
2007-07-10 | Referred to JUDICIARY | |
2007-07-07 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-07-07 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-07-05 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-07-05 | Second consideration, with amendments | |
2007-07-05 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-06-26 | Re-committed to RULES | |
2007-06-26 | First consideration | |
2007-06-26 | Reported as amended | |
2007-05-04 | Referred to JUDICIARY |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1235 |