PA HB1239 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-9)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-03 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-03 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in licensing of drivers, further providing for classes of licenses.
Title
In licensing of drivers, further providing for classes of licenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1239 PN 1466, FP (Y: 191 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1239 PN 1466, FP (Y: 191 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-03 | Senate | Removed from table |
2018-10-03 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-01-31 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2017-06-12 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-06-12 | House | Third consideration and final passage (191-1) |
2017-06-12 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-07 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-06-07 | House | Second consideration |
2017-06-06 | House | Removed from table |
2017-05-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-05-24 | House | First consideration |
2017-05-24 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-04-17 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |