PA HB1252 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on May 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-17 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to House Rule 71)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-17 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to House Rule 71)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 9, 1936 (Sp.Sess.1, P.L.13, No.4), entitled "An act imposing an emergency State tax on liquor, as herein defined, sold by the Pennsylvania Liquor Control Board; providing for the collection and payment of such tax; and imposing duties upon the Department of Revenue and the Pennsylvania Liquor Control Board," further providing for emergency tax on liquors and amount of tax and collection.
Title
Amending the act of June 9, 1936 (Sp.Sess.1, P.L.13, No.4), entitled "An act imposing an emergency State tax on liquor, as herein defined, sold by the Pennsylvania Liquor Control Board; providing for the collection and payment of such tax; and imposing duties upon the Department of Revenue and the Pennsylvania Liquor Control Board," further providing for emergency tax on liquors and amount of tax and collection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-28 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-22 - House - House Liquor Control: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-22 - House - House Liquor Control: Adopt Amendment A01292 (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-22 - House - House Liquor Control: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-22 - House - House Liquor Control: Adopt Amendment A01292 (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-17 | House | Laid on the table (Pursuant to House Rule 71) |
2023-06-28 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2023-06-22 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2023-06-22 | House | First consideration |
2023-06-22 | House | Reported as amended |
2023-05-24 | House | Referred to LIQUOR CONTROL |