PA HB1273 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-09 - Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-09 - Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 12, 1951 (P.L.90, No.21), known as the Liquor Code, in preliminary provisions, further providing for the definitions of "association" and "person"; and, in licenses and regulations and liquor, alcohol and malt and brewed beverages, further providing for applications for hotel, restaurant and club liquor licenses and for sales by liquor licensees and restrictions.
Title
In preliminary provisions, further providing for the definitions of "association" and "person"; and, in licenses and regulations and liquor, alcohol and malt and brewed beverages, further providing for applications for hotel, restaurant and club liquor licenses and for sales by liquor licensees and restrictions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-30 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1273 PN 2002, FP (Y: 193 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - House - House Liquor Control: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - House - House Liquor Control: Adopt Amendment #A02903 A02903 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - House - House Liquor Control: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - House - House Liquor Control: Adopt Amendment #A02903 A02903 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1273 PN 2002, FP (Y: 193 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - House - House Liquor Control: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - House - House Liquor Control: Adopt Amendment #A02903 A02903 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - House - House Liquor Control: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - House - House Liquor Control: Adopt Amendment #A02903 A02903 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-09 | Senate | Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE |
2015-09-30 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-09-30 | House | Third consideration and final passage (193-1) |
2015-09-30 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-09-29 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-09-29 | House | Second consideration |
2015-09-24 | House | Removed from table |
2015-09-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-09-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-06-30 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2015-06-30 | House | First consideration |
2015-06-30 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-06-02 | House | Referred to LIQUOR CONTROL |