PA HB1347 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 25-3)
Status: Introduced on June 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-26 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-26 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 17, 1921 (P.L.682, No.284), known as The Insurance Company Law of 1921, in casualty insurance, further providing for billing.
Title
In casualty insurance, further providing for billing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-18 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-18 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: To Table (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-09-18 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-09-18 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: To Table (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-09-18 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-26 | House | Removed from table |
2020-10-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-08-28 | House | Removed from table |
2020-08-28 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-20 | House | Removed from table |
2020-05-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-04-14 | House | Removed from table |
2020-04-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-01-13 | House | Removed from table |
2020-01-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-10-22 | House | Removed from table |
2019-09-18 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-09-18 | House | First consideration |
2019-09-18 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-06-17 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |