PA HB1392 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-19 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-19 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in size, weight and load, further providing for maximum gross weight of vehicles; in liquid fuels and fuels tax, further providing for definitions and providing for electric vehicle road use fee; and making editorial changes.
Title
In size, weight and load, further providing for maximum gross weight of vehicles; in liquid fuels and fuels tax, further providing for definitions and providing for electric vehicle road use fee; and making editorial changes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-19 - House - House Floor: HB 1392 PN 2060, 2019 A2828, ROTHMAN (Y: 94 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2019-09-19 - House - House Floor: HB 1392 PN 2060, 2019 A2724, CARROLL (Y: 184 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-09-19 - House - House Floor: HB 1392 PN 2060, 2019 A2141, MARSHALL (Y: 186 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A01725 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-19 - House - House Floor: HB 1392 PN 2060, 2019 A2724, CARROLL (Y: 184 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-09-19 - House - House Floor: HB 1392 PN 2060, 2019 A2141, MARSHALL (Y: 186 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A01725 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-19 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-09-19 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2019-09-18 | House | Removed from table |
2019-09-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-09-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-10 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2019-06-10 | House | First consideration |
2019-06-10 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |