PA HB1407 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-7)
Status: Introduced on June 5 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-11-19 - Laid on the table
Status: Introduced on June 5 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-11-19 - Laid on the table
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, further providing for cyber charter school requirements and prohibitions, for cyber charter school enrollment and notification and for applicability.
Title
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, further providing for cyber charter school requirements and prohibitions, for cyber charter school enrollment and notification and for applicability.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-11-19 | Laid on the table | |
2007-11-19 | Removed from table | |
2007-10-15 | Laid on the table | |
2007-10-15 | First consideration | |
2007-10-15 | Reported as amended | |
2007-06-05 | Referred to EDUCATION |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1407 |