PA HB1407 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-4)
Status: Introduced on April 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-20 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-20 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in early learning programs, further providing for Head Start expansion and for duties of department.
Title
In early learning programs, further providing for Head Start expansion and for duties of department.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-06-20 | House | Removed from table |
2011-05-04 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-05-04 | House | First consideration |
2011-05-04 | House | Reported as amended |
2011-04-28 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |