PA HB1428 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-17 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-17 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 19, 1979 (P.L.130, No.48), known as the Health Care Facilities Act, adding provisions relating to resident care monitoring.
Title
Adding provisions relating to resident care monitoring.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - House Floor: HB 1428 PN 1790, FP (Y: 160 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - House - House Floor: HB 1428 PN 1701, 2021 A1548, B. MILLER (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - House - House Floor: HB 1428 PN 1701, 2021 A1499, BENHAM (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - House - House Floor: HB 1428 PN 1701, 2021 A1553, MASSER (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A01456 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A01446 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: To Table (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-15 - House - House Floor: HB 1428 PN 1790, FP (Y: 160 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - House - House Floor: HB 1428 PN 1701, 2021 A1548, B. MILLER (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - House - House Floor: HB 1428 PN 1701, 2021 A1499, BENHAM (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - House - House Floor: HB 1428 PN 1701, 2021 A1553, MASSER (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A01456 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A01446 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: To Table (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-17 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2021-06-15 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-06-15 | House | Third consideration and final passage (160-42) |
2021-06-15 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-14 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-06-14 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2021-06-09 | House | Removed from table |
2021-06-07 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-06-07 | House | First consideration |
2021-06-07 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-05-17 | House | Referred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES |