PA HB1489 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Introduced on August 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-24 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-24 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 53 (Municipalities Generally) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for the inspection and regulation of mobile food vehicles in cities of the first class that use propane or other combustible fuel.
Title
Providing for the inspection and regulation of mobile food vehicles in cities of the first class that use propane or other combustible fuel.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-07-12 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Local Government: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Local Government: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Local Government: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Local Government: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-24 | House | Removed from table |
2016-10-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-07-12 | House | Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 3729 |
2016-07-12 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-06-14 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2016-06-14 | House | First consideration |
2016-06-14 | House | Reported as committed |
2016-02-10 | House | Re-referred to URBAN AFFAIRS |
2016-02-10 | House | Reported with request to re-refer to URBAN AFFAIRS |
2015-08-21 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |