PA HB1578 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING
Pending: Senate Urban Affairs & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 68 (Real and Personal Property) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in creation, alteration and termination of condominiums, further providing for contents of declaration and all condominiums and for amendment of declaration; in management of the condominium, further providing for bylaws; in protection of purchasers, further providing for public offering statement and general provisions; in creation, alteration and termination of cooperatives, further providing for contents of declaration and for amendment of declaration; in management of cooperatives, further providing for bylaws; in protection of cooperative interest purchasers, further providing for public offering statement and general provisions; in creation, alteration and termination of planned communities, further providing for contents of declaration and all planned communities and for amendment of declaration; in management of planned community, further providing for bylaws; and, in protection of purchasers, further providing for public offering statement and general provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In creation, alteration and termination of condominiums, further providing for contents of declaration and all condominiums and for amendment of declaration; in management of the condominium, further providing for bylaws; in protection of purchasers, further providing for public offering statement and general provisions; in creation, alteration and termination of cooperatives, further providing for contents of declaration and for amendment of declaration; in management of cooperatives, further providing for bylaws; in protection of cooperative interest purchasers, further providing for public offering statement and general provisions; in creation, alteration and termination of planned communities, further providing for contents of declaration and all planned communities and for amendment of declaration; in management of planned community, further providing for bylaws; and, in protection of purchasers, further providing for public offering statement and general provisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1578 PN 2044, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-08SenateReferred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING
2019-06-24SenateIn the Senate
2019-06-24HouseThird consideration and final passage (199-0)
2019-06-24HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-20HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-20HouseSecond consideration
2019-06-20HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-11HouseRe-committed to RULES
2019-06-11HouseFirst consideration
2019-06-11HouseReported as committed
2019-06-07HouseReferred to URBAN AFFAIRS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1578
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1578&pn=2044
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=40&theDate=06/11/2019&RollCallId=673
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/20/2019&RollCallId=866
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=546
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/24/2019&RollCallId=899

Bill Comments

feedback