PA HB1600 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-03 - Act No. 135
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-03 - Act No. 135
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 51 (Military Affairs) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for voluntary veterans' preference in private employment; and, in veteran-owned small businesses, further providing for definitions and for regulations and providing for business fee exemption.
Title
Providing for voluntary veterans' preference in private employment; and, in veteran-owned small businesses, further providing for definitions and for regulations and providing for business fee exemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-26 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - House - House Floor: HB 1600 PN 4107, CONCUR (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-10-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1600 PN 4107, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-17 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1600 PN 3177, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1600 PN 2974, 2015 A6714, GABLER (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1600 PN 2974, 2015 A6714, SUSP RULES, GABLER (Y: 187 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Commerce: Adopt Amendment A05521 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - House - House Floor: HB 1600 PN 4107, CONCUR (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-10-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1600 PN 4107, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-17 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1600 PN 3177, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1600 PN 2974, 2015 A6714, GABLER (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1600 PN 2974, 2015 A6714, SUSP RULES, GABLER (Y: 187 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Commerce: Adopt Amendment A05521 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-03 | House | Act No. 135 |
2016-11-03 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2016-10-27 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2016-10-26 | House | Signed in Senate |
2016-10-26 | House | Signed in House |
2016-10-26 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (190-0) |
2016-10-26 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2016-10-25 | House | Referred to RULES |
2016-10-25 | House | In the House |
2016-10-25 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2016-10-24 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2016-10-18 | Senate | Second consideration, with amendments |
2016-10-17 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-06-14 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2016-04-13 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-04-13 | House | Final passage (195-0) |
2016-04-12 | House | Third consideration, with amendments |
2016-04-06 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-04-05 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-04-05 | House | Second consideration |
2016-04-04 | House | Removed from table |
2016-03-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-03-16 | House | First consideration |
2016-03-16 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-09-29 | House | Referred to COMMERCE |