PA HB1716 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 36-14)
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-06 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-06 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Joint Resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, reducing the size of the General Assembly.
Title
A Joint Resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, reducing the size of the General Assembly.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-12-17 - House - HB 1716 PN 2326, FP (Y: 150 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-12-16 - House - HB 1716 PN 2326, 2013 A5067, SUSP RULES, MARKOSEK (Y: 81 N: 116 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2013-12-16 - House - HB 1716 PN 2326, 2013 A4989, SAMUELSON (Y: 96 N: 101 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2013-12-16 - House - HB 1716 PN 2326, 2013 A3519, COHEN (Y: 27 N: 170 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2013-12-16 - House - HB 1716 PN 2326, 2013 A5067, SUSP RULES, MARKOSEK (Y: 81 N: 116 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2013-12-16 - House - HB 1716 PN 2326, 2013 A4989, SAMUELSON (Y: 96 N: 101 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2013-12-16 - House - HB 1716 PN 2326, 2013 A3519, COHEN (Y: 27 N: 170 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-06 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2013-12-17 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-12-17 | House | Third consideration and final passage (150-48) |
2013-12-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-12-16 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-12-16 | House | Second consideration |
2013-12-11 | House | Removed from table |
2013-11-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-11-19 | House | Removed from table |
2013-09-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-09-24 | House | First consideration |
2013-09-24 | House | Reported as committed |
2013-09-18 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |