PA HB1722 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-1)
Status: Introduced on September 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-10 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-10 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in professional employees, further providing for temporary professional employees, for contracts, execution and form, for causes for suspension and for persons to be suspended and to receive tenure, for collective bargaining agreements and for timing of appeal of suspension; and making editorial changes.
Title
In professional employees, further providing for temporary professional employees, for contracts, execution and form, for causes for suspension and for persons to be suspended and to receive tenure, for collective bargaining agreements and for timing of appeal of suspension; and making editorial changes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-09-10 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-04 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2014-06-04 | House | First consideration |
2014-06-04 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-09-30 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |