PA HB1739 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-11 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-11 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a portion of State Route 2034 in Montgomery County as the Cpl. Carl F. Hynek III Memorial Highway.
Title
Designating a portion of State Route 2034 in Montgomery County as the Cpl. Carl F. Hynek III Memorial Highway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - House - House Floor: HB 1739 PN 2610, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-21 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - House - House Floor: HB 1739 PN 2610, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-21 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-11 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2016-06-30 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2016-06-28 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-06-28 | House | Third consideration and final passage (198-0) |
2016-06-28 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-04-11 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-04-11 | House | Second consideration |
2016-04-06 | House | Removed from table |
2016-03-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-03-21 | House | First consideration |
2016-03-21 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-12-04 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |