PA HB1742 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-7)
Status: Enrolled on October 9 2008 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 1969-12-31 - Act No. 113
Status: Enrolled on October 9 2008 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 1969-12-31 - Act No. 113
Summary
An Act requiring scrap processors and recycling facility operators to collect certain information relating to the purchase of scrap material; requiring commercial accounts; and restricting scrap processors and recycling facility operators from purchasing certain materials.
Title
An Act requiring scrap processors and recycling facility operators to collect certain information relating to the purchase of scrap material; requiring commercial accounts; and restricting scrap processors and recycling facility operators from purchasing certain materials.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-10-09 | Approved by the Governor | |
2008-10-09 | Presented to the Governor | |
2008-10-07 | Signed in Senate | |
2008-10-07 | Signed in House | |
2008-10-07 | House concurred in Senate amendments | |
2008-10-07 | Reported as committed | |
2008-10-06 | Referred to RULES | |
2008-10-06 | Final passage | |
2008-10-06 | Vote on final passage reconsidered | |
2008-10-06 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2008-09-24 | Second consideration | |
2008-09-17 | Re-reported as amended | |
2008-06-26 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2008-06-10 | First consideration | |
2008-06-10 | Reported as amended | |
2008-02-14 | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY | |
2008-02-06 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2008-01-15 | Second consideration, with amendments | |
2008-01-14 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-12-12 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-12-12 | Removed from table | |
2007-12-11 | Laid on the table | |
2007-12-11 | First consideration | |
2007-12-11 | Reported as amended | |
2007-07-13 | Referred to COMMERCE |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1742 |