PA HB1838 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 39-20)
Status: Engrossed on July 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-10-25 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-10-25 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in registration of vehicles, further providing for special registration plates; in fees, further providing for exemption of persons, entities and vehicles from fees and for annual hauling permits; in rules of the road in general, further providing for duty of driver in emergency response areas; in other required equipment, providing for counterfeit airbag prevention; in size, weight and load, further providing for maximum gross weight of vehicles and providing for permit for movement of freight via natural gas vehicles; and, in powers of department and local authorities, further providing for specific powers of department and local authorities.
Title
In registration of vehicles, further providing for special registration plates; in fees, further providing for exemption of persons, entities and vehicles from fees and for annual hauling permits; in rules of the road in general, further providing for duty of driver in emergency response areas; in other required equipment, providing for counterfeit airbag prevention; in size, weight and load, further providing for maximum gross weight of vehicles and providing for permit for movement of freight via natural gas vehicles; and, in powers of department and local authorities, further providing for specific powers of department and local authorities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-09-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-07-01 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-07-01 - House - House Floor: HB 1838 PN 3695, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1838 PN 3659, 2015 A9362, GABLER (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1838 PN 3659, 2015 A9362, SUSP RULES, GABLER (Y: 183 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A09002 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-07-01 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-07-01 - House - House Floor: HB 1838 PN 3695, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1838 PN 3659, 2015 A9362, GABLER (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1838 PN 3659, 2015 A9362, SUSP RULES, GABLER (Y: 183 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A09002 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-25 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-10-25 | Senate | Second consideration, with amendments |
2016-09-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-09-27 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2016-07-07 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2016-07-01 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-07-01 | House | Third consideration and final passage (198-0) |
2016-07-01 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-06-30 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-06-30 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2016-06-30 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-06-28 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2016-06-28 | House | First consideration |
2016-06-28 | House | Reported as amended |
2016-02-09 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |