PA HB1918 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of October 20, 1966 (3rd Sp.Sess., P.L.96, No.6), known as the Mental Health and Intellectual Disability Act of 1966, in preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; and, in responsibilities of the State, providing for State center closure moratorium.
Title
In preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; and, in responsibilities of the State, providing for State center closure moratorium.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-22 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A03334 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A03334 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-01-13 | House | Removed from table |
2019-10-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-10-22 | House | First consideration |
2019-10-22 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-10-15 | House | Referred to HEALTH |