PA HB1945 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Engrossed on September 20 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-09-23 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: Senate Labor & Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 20 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-09-23 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: Senate Labor & Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of November 10, 1999 (P.L.491, No.45), known as the Pennsylvania Construction Code Act, in preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; in adoption and enforcement by municipalities, further providing for administration and enforcement; and,in training and certification of inspectors, further providing for training of inspectors.
Title
In preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; in adoption and enforcement by municipalities, further providing for administration and enforcement; and,in training and certification of inspectors, further providing for training of inspectors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-09-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-20 - House - House Floor: HB 1945 PN 3865, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-09-20 - House - House Floor: HB 1945 PN 3865, MOT PROCEED WITH BILL, DELOZIER (Y: 176 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-09-19 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-19 - House - House Floor: HB 1945 PN 3066, 2015 A8539, HARPER (Y: 185 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2016-09-19 - House - House Floor: HB 1945 PN 3066, 2015 A9513, DELOZIER (Y: 187 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-20 - House - House Floor: HB 1945 PN 3865, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-09-20 - House - House Floor: HB 1945 PN 3865, MOT PROCEED WITH BILL, DELOZIER (Y: 176 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-09-19 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-19 - House - House Floor: HB 1945 PN 3066, 2015 A8539, HARPER (Y: 185 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2016-09-19 - House - House Floor: HB 1945 PN 3066, 2015 A9513, DELOZIER (Y: 187 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-23 | Senate | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |
2016-09-20 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-09-20 | House | Third consideration and final passage (192-0) |
2016-09-20 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-09-19 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-09-19 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2016-09-19 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-06-15 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2016-06-15 | House | First consideration |
2016-06-15 | House | Reported as committed |
2016-04-04 | House | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |