PA HB1946 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-11)
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-26 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-26 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a bridge, identified by Bridge Key 46789, on that portion of State Route 3012 over Back Creek on the border of Hamilton Township and St. Thomas Township, Franklin County, as the Sergeant Melvin G. Ehrhart Memorial Bridge.
Title
Designating a bridge, identified by Bridge Key 46789, on that portion of State Route 3012 over Back Creek on the border of Hamilton Township and St. Thomas Township, Franklin County, as the Sergeant Melvin G. Ehrhart Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1946 PN 2710, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1946 PN 2710, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-26 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2019-12-17 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-12-17 | House | Third consideration and final passage (196-0) |
2019-12-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-12-16 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-12-16 | House | Second consideration |
2019-12-10 | House | Removed from table |
2019-11-18 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-11-18 | House | First consideration |
2019-11-18 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-10-18 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |