PA HB1974 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 29-12)
Status: Introduced on September 14 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-11-16 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 14 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-11-16 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 3, 1937 (P.L.1333, No.320), known as the Pennsylvania Election Code, further providing for powers and duties of county boards.
Title
Further providing for powers and duties of county boards.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-11-16 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-11-16 | Removed from table | |
2009-11-10 | Laid on the table | |
2009-11-10 | First consideration | |
2009-11-10 | Reported as committed | |
2009-09-14 | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |