PA HB2004 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on October 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-21 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-21 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 2, 1993 (P.L.359, No.50), known as the Keystone Recreation, Park and Conservation Fund Act, further providing for definitions, for Keystone Recreation, Park and Conservation Fund, for duties, responsibilities and limitations on agencies, for allocation from fund and for waivers; and making related repeals.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for Keystone Recreation, Park and Conservation Fund, for duties, responsibilities and limitations on agencies, for allocation from fund and for waivers; and making related repeals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-05 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Adopt Amendment A05442 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Adopt Amendment A05442 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-21 | House | Removed from table |
2020-10-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-07-15 | House | Removed from table |
2020-07-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-19 | House | Removed from table |
2020-05-05 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-05 | House | First consideration |
2020-05-05 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-10-29 | House | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |