PA HB2016 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-4)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-25 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-25 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in assault, providing for the offense of harassment of law enforcement officer; and imposing penalties.
Title
In assault, providing for the offense of harassment of law enforcement officer; and imposing penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - House - House Floor: HB 2016 PN 2830, FP (Y: 170 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - House Floor: HB 2016 PN 2830, 2019 A5457, KENYATTA (Y: 71 N: 131 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-05-19 - House - House Floor: HB 2016 PN 2830, 2019 A5582, D. MILLER (Y: 93 N: 109 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-05-19 - House - House Floor: HB 2016 PN 2830, 2019 A5579, D. MILLER (Y: 73 N: 129 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-05-19 - House - House Floor: HB 2016 PN 2830, 2019 A5428, D. MILLER (Y: 81 N: 121 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-05-04 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - House - House Floor: HB 2016 PN 2830, FP (Y: 170 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - House Floor: HB 2016 PN 2830, 2019 A5457, KENYATTA (Y: 71 N: 131 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-05-19 - House - House Floor: HB 2016 PN 2830, 2019 A5582, D. MILLER (Y: 93 N: 109 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-05-19 - House - House Floor: HB 2016 PN 2830, 2019 A5579, D. MILLER (Y: 73 N: 129 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-05-19 - House - House Floor: HB 2016 PN 2830, 2019 A5428, D. MILLER (Y: 81 N: 121 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-05-04 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-25 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2020-05-20 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-05-20 | House | Third consideration and final passage (170-32) |
2020-05-20 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-05-19 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-05-19 | House | Second consideration |
2020-05-05 | House | Removed from table |
2020-05-04 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-04 | House | First consideration |
2020-05-04 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-10-30 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |