PA HB2096 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Third consideration and final passage (201-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Third consideration and final passage (201-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 17, 1921 (P.L.682, No.284), known as The Insurance Company Law of 1921, in surplus lines, providing for surplus lines fees and further providing for monthly reports.
Title
In surplus lines, providing for surplus lines fees and further providing for monthly reports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-29 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-29 - House - House Floor: HB 2096 PN 2677, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-29 - House - House Floor: HB 2096 PN 2677, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2024-04-29 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2024-04-17 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2024-04-17 | House | Second consideration |
2024-04-16 | House | Removed from table |
2024-03-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2024-03-25 | House | First consideration |
2024-03-25 | House | Reported as committed |
2024-03-12 | House | Referred to INSURANCE |