PA HB2135 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-9)
Status: Engrossed on July 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-10 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-10 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 32773, on that portion of U.S. Route 6 over the Tioga River, Mansfield Borough, Tioga County, as the Mansfield Veterans Memorial Bridge.
Title
Designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 32773, on that portion of U.S. Route 6 over the Tioga River, Mansfield Borough, Tioga County, as the Mansfield Veterans Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - House - House Floor: HB 2135 PN 3035, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - House - House Floor: HB 2135 PN 3035, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-10 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2020-07-13 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-07-13 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2020-07-13 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-04-06 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-04-06 | House | Second consideration |
2020-02-05 | House | Removed from table |
2020-01-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-01-15 | House | First consideration |
2020-01-15 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-12-16 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |