PA HB2266 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Engrossed on October 26 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-10-26 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 26 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-10-26 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in sentencing, providing for sentencing for offenses involving indecent exposure when children present.
Title
In sentencing, providing for sentencing for offenses involving indecent exposure when children present.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - House - House Floor: HB 2266 PN 3738, FP (Y: 184 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-10-19 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - House - House Floor: HB 2266 PN 3738, FP (Y: 184 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-10-19 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-26 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2016-10-26 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-10-26 | House | Third consideration and final passage (184-6) |
2016-10-26 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-10-25 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-10-25 | House | Second consideration |
2016-10-24 | House | Removed from table |
2016-10-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-10-19 | House | First consideration |
2016-10-19 | House | Reported as committed |
2016-07-21 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |