PA HB230 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-25 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-25 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, in Independent Fiscal Office, further providing for revenue estimates.
Title
In Independent Fiscal Office, further providing for revenue estimates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Floor: HB 230 PN 385, FP (Y: 128 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Floor: HB 230 PN 385, 2021 A320, WEBSTER (Y: 90 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-15 - House - House Floor: HB 230 PN 385, 2021 A317, BOYLE (Y: 90 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-15 - House - House Floor: HB 230 PN 385, 2021 A308, N. NELSON (Y: 90 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-15 - House - House Floor: HB 230 PN 385, 2021 A310, BRADFORD (Y: 90 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-15 - House - House Floor: HB 230 PN 385, 2021 A307, BRADFORD (Y: 90 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-04 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A00244 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Floor: HB 230 PN 385, FP (Y: 128 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Floor: HB 230 PN 385, 2021 A320, WEBSTER (Y: 90 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-15 - House - House Floor: HB 230 PN 385, 2021 A317, BOYLE (Y: 90 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-15 - House - House Floor: HB 230 PN 385, 2021 A308, N. NELSON (Y: 90 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-15 - House - House Floor: HB 230 PN 385, 2021 A310, BRADFORD (Y: 90 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-15 - House - House Floor: HB 230 PN 385, 2021 A307, BRADFORD (Y: 90 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-04 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A00244 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-25 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2021-03-24 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |
2021-03-16 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-03-16 | House | Third consideration and final passage (128-74) |
2021-03-16 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-03-15 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-03-15 | House | Second consideration |
2021-02-05 | House | Removed from table |
2021-02-04 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-02-04 | House | First consideration |
2021-02-04 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-01-25 | House | Referred to FINANCE |