PA HB2408 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.343, No.176), known as The Fiscal Code, in emergency finance and tax provisions, providing for exemption from taxation and for nonprofit corporations and charitable trusts.
Title
In emergency finance and tax provisions, providing for exemption from taxation and for nonprofit corporations and charitable trusts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-11 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - House - House Floor: HB 2408 PN 3676, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-29 - House - House Floor: HB 2408 PN 3591, 2019 A5295, WHITE (Y: 109 N: 93 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-29 - House - House Floor: HB 2408 PN 3591, 2019 A5295, GERMANE, MARKOSEK (Y: 109 N: 93 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-29 - House - House Floor: HB 2408 PN 3591, 2019 A5369, DUNBAR (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-20 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-20 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A05134 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - House - House Floor: HB 2408 PN 3676, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-29 - House - House Floor: HB 2408 PN 3591, 2019 A5295, WHITE (Y: 109 N: 93 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-29 - House - House Floor: HB 2408 PN 3591, 2019 A5295, GERMANE, MARKOSEK (Y: 109 N: 93 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-29 - House - House Floor: HB 2408 PN 3591, 2019 A5369, DUNBAR (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-20 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-20 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A05134 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-12 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-05-11 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |
2020-05-04 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-05-04 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2020-05-04 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-04-29 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-04-29 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2020-04-21 | House | Removed from table |
2020-04-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-04-20 | House | First consideration |
2020-04-20 | House | Reported as amended |
2020-04-14 | House | Referred to FINANCE |