PA HB2449 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-4)
Status: Introduced on April 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-11-15 - Re-committed to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Pursuant to Rule 71)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-11-15 - Re-committed to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Pursuant to Rule 71)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act relating to education concerning the organic compound bisphenol A; and imposing duties on the Department of Health.
Title
Relating to education concerning the organic compound bisphenol A; and imposing duties on the Department of Health.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-11-15 | Re-committed to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Pursuant to Rule 71) | |
2010-07-02 | Re-reported as committed | |
2010-06-28 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-06-28 | Re-reported as committed | |
2010-06-09 | Re-committed to RULES | |
2010-06-09 | First consideration | |
2010-06-09 | Reported as committed | |
2010-06-09 | Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 3872 | |
2010-04-22 | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |