PA HB247 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 32-5)
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-29 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: Senate Consumer Protection & Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-29 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: Senate Consumer Protection & Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 4, 1996 (P.L.911, No.147), known as the Telemarketer Registration Act, further providing for definitions.
Title
Further providing for definitions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-28 - House - HB 247 PN 1752, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-29 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2011-06-28 | Senate | In the Senate |
2011-06-28 | House | Third consideration and final passage (198-0) |
2011-06-28 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2011-06-27 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-06-27 | House | Second consideration |
2011-06-26 | House | Removed from table |
2011-06-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-06-20 | House | Removed from table |
2011-05-04 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-05-04 | House | First consideration |
2011-05-04 | House | Reported as amended |
2011-01-26 | House | Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS |