PA HB2539 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-2)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-20 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-20 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 21, 1989 (P.L.672, No.87), known as the Health Club Act, providing for emergency COVID-19 provisions.
Title
Providing for emergency COVID-19 provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-26 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-20 | House | Removed from table |
2020-10-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-07-14 | House | Removed from table |
2020-05-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-26 | House | First consideration |
2020-05-26 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-05-21 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |