PA HB2868 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Engrossed on October 19 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-10-26 - Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING
Pending: Senate Urban Affairs & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.343, No.176), known as The Fiscal Code, in Pennsylvania Housing Finance Agency, further providing for definitions and for mortgage and rental assistance program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In Pennsylvania Housing Finance Agency, further providing for definitions and for mortgage and rental assistance program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-19 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A07622 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - House - House Floor: HB 2868 PN 4543, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - House - House Floor: HB 2868 PN 4543, MOT PROCEED WITH BILL, BENNINGHOFF (Y: 198 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-17 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Amended A07186 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-17 - House - House Urban Affairs: Adopt Amendment A07186 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-26SenateReferred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING
2020-10-19SenateIn the Senate
2020-10-19HouseThird consideration and final passage (202-0)
2020-10-19HouseRe-reported as amended
2020-09-30HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-09-30HouseSecond consideration
2020-09-29HouseRemoved from table
2020-09-17HouseLaid on the table
2020-09-17HouseFirst consideration
2020-09-17HouseReported as amended
2020-09-15HouseReferred to URBAN AFFAIRS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2868
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2868&pn=4379
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2868&pn=4392
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2868&pn=4543
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=40&theDate=09/17/2020&RollCallId=2461
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=40&theDate=09/17/2020&RollCallId=2462
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1665
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1666
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=10/19/2020&RollCallId=2597
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=10/19/2020&RollCallId=2596

Bill Comments

feedback