PA HB432 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-8)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-06 - Referred to PUBLIC HEALTH AND WELFARE
Pending: Senate Public Health & Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-06 - Referred to PUBLIC HEALTH AND WELFARE
Pending: Senate Public Health & Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Public Welfare Code, in departmental powers and duties as to supervision and licensing, further providing for definitions; and providing for child abuse recognition and reporting training.
Title
In departmental powers and duties as to supervision and licensing, further providing for definitions; and providing for child abuse recognition and reporting training.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-17 - House - HB 432 PN 1516, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - HB 432 PN 1429, 2013 A924, DERMODY (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - HB 432 PN 1429, 2013 A807, ROZZI (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - HB 432 PN 1429, 2013 A924, DERMODY (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - HB 432 PN 1429, 2013 A807, ROZZI (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-06 | Senate | Referred to PUBLIC HEALTH AND WELFARE |
2013-04-17 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-04-17 | House | Third consideration and final passage (191-0) |
2013-04-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-04-16 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-04-16 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2013-04-10 | House | Removed from table |
2013-04-09 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-04-09 | House | First consideration |
2013-04-09 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-02-04 | House | Referred to CHILDREN AND YOUTH |