PA HB441 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-24 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-24 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 30, 1981 (P.L.128, No.43), known as the Agricultural Area Security Law, further providing for definitions and for purchase of agricultural conservation easements.
Title
Further providing for definitions and for purchase of agricultural conservation easements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Floor: HB 441 PN 427, FP (Y: 185 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Floor: HB 441 PN 427, FP (Y: 185 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-24 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-06-23 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |
2019-03-18 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-03-18 | House | Third consideration and final passage (185-9) |
2019-03-18 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-03-13 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-03-13 | House | Second consideration |
2019-03-12 | House | Removed from table |
2019-02-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-02-20 | House | First consideration |
2019-02-20 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-02-11 | House | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |