PA HB450 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Community, Economic & Recreational Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Community, Economic & Recreational Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 23, 2002 (P.L.298, No.39), known as the Main Street Act, further providing for the duration of grants.
Title
Further providing for the duration of grants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - House - House Floor: HB 450 PN 418, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 166 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - House - House Floor: HB 450 PN 418, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 166 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-06 | Senate | Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT |
2023-06-06 | Senate | In the Senate |
2023-06-06 | House | Third consideration and final passage (166-37) |
2023-06-06 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2023-06-05 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-06-05 | House | Second consideration |
2023-05-24 | House | Removed from table |
2023-05-03 | House | Laid on the table |
2023-05-03 | House | First consideration |
2023-05-03 | House | Reported as committed |
2023-03-16 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |