PA HB522 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 37-11)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, providing for the Career and Technical Education Investment Incentive Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for the Career and Technical Education Investment Incentive Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House Floor: HB 522 PN 987, FP (Y: 162 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Floor: HB 522 PN 861, 2019 A170, LONGIETTI (Y: 188 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A00152 (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28SenateReferred to EDUCATION
2019-03-19SenateIn the Senate
2019-03-19HouseThird consideration and final passage (162-34)
2019-03-19HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-03-18HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-03-18HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-03-13HouseRemoved from table
2019-03-11HouseLaid on the table
2019-03-11HouseFirst consideration
2019-03-11HouseReported as amended
2019-02-19HouseReferred to EDUCATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=522
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0522&pn=0516
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0522&pn=0861
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0522&pn=0987
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=03/11/2019&RollCallId=75
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=03/11/2019&RollCallId=76
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=84
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=102
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=03/19/2019&RollCallId=147

Bill Comments

feedback