PA HB529 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-6)
Status: Engrossed on October 5 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-10-11 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 5 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-10-11 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, defining the offense of false caller identification information display; and imposing penalties.
Title
Defining the offense of false caller identification information display; and imposing penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-10-05 - House - HB 529 PN 496, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-11 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2011-10-05 | Senate | In the Senate |
2011-10-05 | House | Third consideration and final passage (199-0) |
2011-10-05 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2011-10-04 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-10-04 | House | Second consideration |
2011-10-03 | House | Removed from table |
2011-05-03 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-05-03 | House | Removed from table |
2011-03-01 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-03-01 | House | First consideration |
2011-03-01 | House | Reported as committed |
2011-02-08 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |