PA HB57 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act abolishing numerous State authorities, boards, commissions, committees, councils and representatives; and making related repeals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Abolishing numerous State authorities, boards, commissions, committees, councils and representatives; and making related repeals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House Floor: HB 57 PN 1678, FP (Y: 114 N: 77 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Floor: HB 57 PN 1452, 2019 A808, FRITZ (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A00756 (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17SenateReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT
2019-05-06SenateIn the Senate
2019-05-06HouseThird consideration and final passage (114-77)
2019-05-06HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-05-01HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-05-01HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-04-30HouseRemoved from table
2019-04-16HouseLaid on the table
2019-04-16HouseFirst consideration
2019-04-16HouseReported as amended
2019-03-14HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=57
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0057&pn=0913
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0057&pn=1452
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0057&pn=1678
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=04/16/2019&RollCallId=299
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=04/16/2019&RollCallId=300
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=231
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=256
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/06/2019&RollCallId=440

Bill Comments

feedback