PA HB60 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 68-23)
Status: Passed on November 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-11-23 - Act No. 105
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 68-23)
Status: Passed on November 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-11-23 - Act No. 105
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 3, 1959 (P.L.1688, No.621), known as the Housing Finance Agency Law, providing for the Pennsylvania Housing Affordability and Rehabilitation Enhancement Program; and establishing the Housing Affordability and Rehabilitation Enhancement Fund.
Title
Providing for the Pennsylvania Housing Affordability and Rehabilitation Enhancement Program; and establishing the Housing Affordability and Rehabilitation Enhancement Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-11-15 - House - HB 60 PN 3975, CONCUR (Y: 186 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-10-12 - Senate - HB 60 PN 3975, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-26 - House - HB 60 PN 3554, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 179 N: 8 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-10-12 - Senate - HB 60 PN 3975, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-26 - House - HB 60 PN 3554, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 179 N: 8 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-11-23 | Act No. 105 | |
2010-11-23 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-11-17 | Presented to the Governor | |
2010-11-17 | Signed in Senate | |
2010-11-15 | Signed in House | |
2010-11-15 | House concurred in Senate amendments | |
2010-11-15 | Reported as committed | |
2010-10-18 | Referred to RULES | |
2010-10-12 | In the House | |
2010-10-12 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-09-29 | Second consideration | |
2010-09-21 | Re-reported as committed | |
2010-06-30 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-06-23 | First consideration | |
2010-06-23 | Reported as amended | |
2010-04-29 | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING | |
2010-04-26 | In the Senate | |
2010-04-26 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-04-21 | Second consideration | |
2010-04-19 | Re-reported as amended | |
2010-03-08 | Re-committed to COMMERCE | |
2010-01-25 | Re-reported as amended | |
2009-02-05 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-02-05 | Removed from table | |
2009-02-04 | Laid on the table | |
2009-02-04 | First consideration | |
2009-02-04 | Reported as committed | |
2009-01-30 | Referred to COMMERCE |