PA HB64 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-08 - Act No. 74
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-08 - Act No. 74
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for suicide prevention continuing education.
Title
Providing for suicide prevention continuing education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 64 PN 55, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - House - House Floor: HB 64 PN 55, FP (Y: 188 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House Education: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House Education: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - House - House Floor: HB 64 PN 55, FP (Y: 188 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House Education: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House Education: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-08 | Senate | Act No. 74 |
2016-07-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Signed in House |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Removed from table |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2016-05-10 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-06-12 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2015-06-10 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-06-10 | House | Third consideration and final passage (188-0) |
2015-06-10 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-06-09 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-06-09 | House | Second consideration |
2015-06-08 | House | Removed from table |
2015-06-01 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-06-01 | House | First consideration |
2015-06-01 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-02-25 | House | Re-referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2015-02-25 | House | Reported with request to re-refer to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2015-01-21 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |