PA HB65 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-15)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Act No. 44
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 3047 over the South Branch of Blacklick Creek, Blacklick Township, Cambria County, as the Private First Class Steve L. Klosz Memorial Bridge; designating the 2100 to 2200 block of Castor Avenue, State Route 1005, in Philadelphia County as the Police Officer Raymond Diaz, Jr., Memorial Highway; designating the portion of Interstate 376 from the end of the bridge identified as Bridge Key 3522 to the exit at State Route 51 in Beaver County, as the Richard L. Shaw Memorial Highway; designating the bridge identified as Bridge Key 3522 on that portion of Interstate 376 over the Ohio River in Vanport Township, Beaver County, as the USAF Combat Controller Staff Sgt. Dylan Elchin Memorial Bridge; designating the first block of West Main Street, State Route 1010, in Fleetwood Borough, Berks County, as the Alex J. Szoke Highway; designating the bridge identified as Bridge Key 15986 on that portion of Interstate 79 northbound over West 16th Street in the City of Erie, Erie County, as the Thomas J. Kennedy, Jr., Memorial Bridge; designating the bridge on that portion of State Route 4011 over Pine Creek, Hegins Township, Schuylkill County, as the A. Donald Buffington Memorial Bridge; designating a portion of Pennsylvania Route 144 beginning at the intersection of Pennsylvania Route 64 in Pleasant Gap and ending at the intersection of Pennsylvania Route 45 in Centre Hall, Centre County, as the Duster-Quad 50-Searchlight Highway; and designating a portion of Pennsylvania Route 50 in Independence Township, Washington County, as the Lt. Col. Juanita L. Warman Memorial Highway.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 3047 over the South Branch of Blacklick Creek, Blacklick Township, Cambria County, as the Private First Class Steve L. Klosz Memorial Bridge; designating the 2100 to 2200 block of Castor Avenue, State Route 1005, in Philadelphia County as the Police Officer Raymond Diaz, Jr., Memorial Highway; designating the portion of Interstate 376 from the end of the bridge identified as Bridge Key 3522 to the exit at State Route 51 in Beaver County, as the Richard L. Shaw Memorial Highway; designating the bridge identified as Bridge Key 3522 on that portion of Interstate 376 over the Ohio River in Vanport Township, Beaver County, as the USAF Combat Controller Staff Sgt. Dylan Elchin Memorial Bridge; designating the first block of West Main Street, State Route 1010, in Fleetwood Borough, Berks County, as the Alex J. Szoke Highway; designating the bridge identified as Bridge Key 15986 on that portion of Interstate 79 northbound over West 16th Street in the City of Erie, Erie County, as the Thomas J. Kennedy, Jr., Memorial Bridge; designating the bridge on that portion of State Route 4011 over Pine Creek, Hegins Township, Schuylkill County, as the A. Donald Buffington Memorial Bridge; designating a portion of Pennsylvania Route 144 beginning at the intersection of Pennsylvania Route 64 in Pleasant Gap and ending at the intersection of Pennsylvania Route 45 in Centre Hall, Centre County, as the Duster-Quad 50-Searchlight Highway; and designating a portion of Pennsylvania Route 50 in Independence Township, Washington County, as the Lt. Col. Juanita L. Warman Memorial Highway.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-26 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - House Floor: HB 65 PN 2240, CONCUR (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 65 PN 2240, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Floor: HB 65 PN 69, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-02HouseAct No. 44
2019-07-02HouseApproved by the Governor
2019-06-27HousePresented to the Governor
2019-06-26HouseSigned in Senate
2019-06-26HouseSigned in House
2019-06-26HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (201-0)
2019-06-26HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2019-06-25HouseReferred to RULES
2019-06-25HouseIn the House
2019-06-25SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2019-06-24SenateAmended on third consideration
2019-06-19SenateSecond consideration
2019-06-12SenateFirst consideration
2019-06-12SenateReported as committed
2019-03-18SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2019-03-12SenateIn the Senate
2019-03-12HouseThird consideration and final passage (195-0)
2019-03-12HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-02-21HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-02-21HouseSecond consideration
2019-02-20HouseRemoved from table
2019-02-19HouseLaid on the table
2019-02-19HouseFirst consideration
2019-02-19HouseReported as committed
2019-01-28HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=65
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0065&pn=0069
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0065&pn=2240
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=02/19/2019&RollCallId=51
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=73
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=03/12/2019&RollCallId=105
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=19&theDate=06/12/2019&RollCallId=293
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=175
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=602
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/26/2019&RollCallId=936

Bill Comments

feedback