PA HB827 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Act No. 37 of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Act No. 37 of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 72 (Taxation and Fiscal Affairs) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, establishing microenterprise loan programs and abating real property assessment.
Title
Establishing microenterprise loan programs and abating real property assessment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-25 - House - House Floor: HB 827 PN 1901, CONCUR (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 827 PN 1901, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Urban Affairs And Housing: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House Floor: HB 827 PN 809, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 827 PN 1901, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Urban Affairs And Housing: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House Floor: HB 827 PN 809, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | House | Act No. 37 of 2021 |
2021-06-30 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2021-06-28 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2021-06-25 | House | Signed in Senate |
2021-06-25 | House | Signed in House |
2021-06-25 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (201-0) |
2021-06-24 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2021-06-24 | House | Referred to RULES |
2021-06-23 | House | In the House |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-06-16 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING |
2021-04-05 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-04-05 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2021-04-05 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-03-24 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-03-24 | House | Second consideration |
2021-03-23 | House | Removed from table |
2021-03-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-03-22 | House | First consideration |
2021-03-22 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-03-08 | House | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS |